There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

BEST Act
Better Energy Storage Technology Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the United States Energy Storage Competitiveness Act of 2007 to establish a research, development, and demonstration program for grid-scale energy storage systems, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/23/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
02/12/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
02/12/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
12/19/2019Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Energy
12/19/2019Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Energy
05/23/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
05/23/2019Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/23/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (102)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6]* 05/23/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 05/23/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16]* 05/23/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 06/05/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/12/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 06/12/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/21/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 06/21/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 07/17/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 07/17/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 08/16/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/06/2019
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 09/13/2019
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/17/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 09/26/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 09/26/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 10/16/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/21/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 10/21/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 10/22/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/22/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/23/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/28/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/28/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 10/28/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/28/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 10/28/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/28/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 10/30/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 10/30/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/31/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/31/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/05/2019
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/08/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 11/08/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 11/13/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/13/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/13/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 11/14/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 11/15/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/20/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/03/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 12/03/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 12/03/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/10/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 12/12/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/13/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/17/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/08/2020
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/10/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 01/10/2020
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/28/2020
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/28/2020
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 01/30/2020
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4] 02/12/2020
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 02/13/2020
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/13/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/18/2020
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 03/04/2020
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1] 03/05/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/25/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/25/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/25/2020
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 06/25/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 06/25/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/25/2020
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 06/25/2020
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/25/2020
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 06/29/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/29/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/16/2020
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 07/16/2020
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/16/2020
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 07/16/2020
Rep. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 07/21/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/29/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/29/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/29/2020
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 07/29/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 07/29/2020
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 07/29/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 07/29/2020
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/29/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/29/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/29/2020
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 07/29/2020
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/29/2020
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/29/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/30/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 07/30/2020
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/30/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 07/30/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/30/2020
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/30/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 07/30/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/30/2020
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 07/31/2020
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/31/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 07/31/2020
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/31/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 08/04/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 08/04/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology05/23/2019 Referred to
02/12/2020 Markup by
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Energy05/23/2019 Referred to
12/19/2019 Markup by
12/19/2019 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2986. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/23/2019)

Better Energy Storage Technology Act or the BEST Act

This bill addresses grid-scale energy storage systems.

The bill requires the Department of Energy (DOE) to establish within its Office of Electricity a research, development, and demonstration program for grid-scale energy storage systems.

DOE must enter into agreements to carry out not more than five demonstration projects and develop a 10-year strategic plan and cost targets for grid-scale energy storage systems.