Committees: H.R.3 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/19/2019 Referred to
12/06/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-324,Part 1
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health09/20/2019 Referred to
09/25/2019 Hearings by
House Ways and Means09/19/2019 Referred to
10/22/2019 Markup by
12/06/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-324,Part 2
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health09/19/2019 Referred to
House Education and Labor09/19/2019 Referred to
10/17/2019 Markup by
12/09/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-324,Part 3