There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 13308 Midland Road in Poway, California, as the "Ray Chavez Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/21/2020Became Public Law No: 116-230. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2020Signed by President.
12/11/2020Presented to President.
12/03/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/03/2020Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7220-7221)
09/30/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
09/30/2020Committee on Oversight and Reform discharged.
05/23/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/21/2020Became Public Law No: 116-230. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2020Signed by President.
12/11/2020HousePresented to President.
12/07/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/03/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/03/2020SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7220-7221)
10/01/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/30/2020-12:27pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/30/2020-12:27pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H5070)
09/30/2020-12:26pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5070)
09/30/2020HouseCommittee on Oversight and Reform discharged.
09/30/2020-12:26pmHouseMr. Connolly asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
12/19/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Reform
05/23/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
05/23/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 05/23/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 05/23/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/23/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 05/23/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/25/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/25/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/25/2019
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/25/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/25/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/25/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/25/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/25/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/25/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 06/25/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/25/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/25/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/25/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/25/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 06/25/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 06/25/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/25/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/25/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 06/25/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 06/25/2019
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 06/25/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 06/25/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 06/25/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/25/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/25/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/25/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/25/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/25/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 06/25/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/25/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/25/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 06/25/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 06/25/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/25/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/25/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/25/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 06/25/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/25/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/25/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/25/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 06/25/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 06/25/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 06/25/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 06/25/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/25/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 06/25/2019
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12] 07/15/2019
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 07/15/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Reform05/23/2019 Referred to
12/19/2019 Markup by
09/30/2020 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs10/01/2020 Referred to
12/03/2020 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.3005.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3005. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-230 (12/21/2020)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 13308 Midland Road in Poway, California, as the "Ray Chavez Post Office Building."