There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Ensuring Equal Access to Shelter Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Ensuring Equal Access to Shelter Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development from implementing a proposed rule regarding requirements under Community Planning and Development housing programs.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
08/13/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-185.
05/23/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
08/13/2019Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 143.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/13/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-185.
06/11/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 26.
06/11/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/23/2019Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/23/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/30/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/30/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 05/30/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 05/30/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 05/30/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/30/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 05/30/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/03/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 06/03/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 06/03/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/03/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/03/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/03/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/03/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/03/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/03/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/03/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 06/04/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/04/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 06/04/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/06/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 06/06/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 06/06/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/06/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/06/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 06/10/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/10/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 06/10/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/10/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/11/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/11/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/12/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 06/12/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/13/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/18/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/18/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/18/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/18/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/19/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/19/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 06/19/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/24/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 06/26/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/25/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 08/02/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/02/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services05/23/2019 Referred to
06/11/2019 Markup by
08/13/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-185

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.