There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Retired Pay Restoration Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to permit additional retired members of the Armed Forces who have a service-connected disability to receive both disability compensation from the Department of Veterans Affairs for their disability and either retired pay by reason of their years of military service or combat-related special compensation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
02/01/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/24/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
01/08/2019Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2019Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (112)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/23/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/23/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/30/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/30/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/30/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 01/30/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/30/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/30/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 01/30/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/30/2019
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 02/06/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/06/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/06/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 02/06/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/06/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/06/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/08/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/08/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 02/08/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/13/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 02/13/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/13/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/13/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 02/13/2019
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 02/13/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 02/13/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/13/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 02/13/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 02/19/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 02/19/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 02/26/2019
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/26/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/28/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/28/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/05/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 03/05/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/07/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/07/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 03/07/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/07/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 03/07/2019
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/07/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 03/07/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 03/08/2019
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 03/08/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 03/08/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 03/11/2019
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/11/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/11/2019
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/11/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/14/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/14/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 03/14/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 03/14/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 03/14/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/14/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 03/14/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/14/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 03/14/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/14/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 03/21/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 03/21/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/25/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/25/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/25/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 03/25/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 03/25/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 04/03/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/04/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/10/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/18/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 04/18/2019
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 04/18/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 05/01/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/01/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/01/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/07/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 05/07/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 05/09/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 05/09/2019
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1] 05/09/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 05/16/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 06/05/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 06/13/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/26/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 07/09/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 07/15/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 07/15/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 08/06/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 08/06/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 08/06/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/06/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/06/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/06/2019
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/11/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 10/08/2019
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/22/2019
Rep. Murphy, Gregory [R-NC-3] 11/26/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 01/03/2020
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 01/07/2020
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 01/08/2020
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 01/13/2020
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 01/24/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/12/2020
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 03/02/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/16/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/11/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 06/11/2020
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 11/20/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Armed Services01/08/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel01/24/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs01/08/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs02/01/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.303.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.303. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/08/2019)

Retired Pay Restoration Act

This bill allows the receipt of both military retired pay and veterans' disability compensation with respect to any service-connected disability. Under current law, only individuals with service-connected disabilities rated at 50% or more receive both without offset.

Individuals who were retired or separated after at least 20 years of military service due to a service-connected disability shall be eligible for the full concurrent receipt of both veterans' disability compensation and either military retired pay or combat-related special pay.