Text: H.R.3056 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/03/2019)


116th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 3056


To provide supplemental appropriations relating to border security, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

June 3, 2019

Mr. Rogers of Alabama (for himself and Mr. Higgins of Louisiana) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned


A BILL

To provide supplemental appropriations relating to border security, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, That the following sums are appropriated, out of any money in the Treasury not otherwise appropriated, for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, for the following purpose, namely:

DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE

Military Personnel

national guard personnel, army

For an additional amount for “National Guard Personnel, Army”, for necessary expenses to respond to the significant rise in unaccompanied minors and family unit aliens at the southwest border and related activities, $172,056,000: Provided, That such amount is designated by the Congress as an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985: Provided further, That the amount provided under this heading shall be available only if the President designates such amount as being for an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of such Act.

Operation And Maintenance

operation and maintenance, army

For an additional amount for “Operation and Maintenance, Army” for necessary expenses to respond to the significant rise in unaccompanied minors and family unit aliens at the southwest border and related activities, $135,603,000: Provided, That such amount is designated by the Congress as an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985: Provided further, That the amount provided under this heading shall be available only if the President designates such amount as being for an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of such Act.

operation and maintenance, marine corps

For an additional amount for “Operation and Maintenance, Marine Corps” for necessary expenses to respond to the significant rise in unaccompanied minors and family unit aliens at the southwest border and related activities, $13,025,000: Provided, That such amount is designated by the Congress as an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985: Provided further, That the amount provided under this heading shall be available only if the President designates such amount as being for an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of such Act.

operation and maintenance, air force

For an additional amount for “Operation and Maintenance, Air Force” for necessary expenses to respond to the significant rise in unaccompanied minors and family unit aliens at the southwest border and related activities, $35,372,000: Provided, That such amount is designated by the Congress as an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985: Provided further, That the amount provided under this heading shall be available only if the President designates such amount as being for an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of such Act.

operation and maintenance, army national guard

For an additional amount for “Operation and Maintenance, Army National Guard” for necessary expenses to respond to the significant rise in unaccompanied minors and family unit aliens at the southwest border and related activities, $21,024,000: Provided, That such amount is designated by the Congress as an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985: Provided further, That the amount provided under this heading shall be available only if the President designates such amount as being for an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of such Act.

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Administration For Children And Families

refugee and entrant assistance

For an additional amount for “Refugee and Entrant Assistance” $2,881,552,000, to be merged with and available for the same period as funds appropriated in Public Law 115–245 for carrying out section 414 of the Immigration and Nationality Act, section 501 of the Refugee Education Assistance Act of 1980, section 462 of the Homeland Security Act of 2002, and section 235 of the William Wilberforce Trafficking Victims Protection Reauthorization Act of 2008: Provided, That such amount is designated by the Congress as an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985: Provided further, That the amount provided under this heading shall be available only if the President designates such amount as being for an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of such Act.

DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

Security, Enforcement, And Border Protection

U.s. Customs And Border Protection

operations and support

For an additional amount for “Operations and Support” for necessary expenses to respond to the significant rise in unaccompanied minors and family unit aliens at the southwest border and related activities, $479,528,000; of which $190,000,000 shall be available until September 30, 2020: Provided, That such amount is designated by the Congress as an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985: Provided further, That the amount provided under this heading shall be available only if the President designates such amount as being for an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of such Act.

procurement, construction, and improvements

For an additional amount for “Procurement, Construction, and Improvements” for necessary expenses to respond to the significant rise in unaccompanied minors and family unit aliens at the southwest border and related activities, $85,000,000, to remain available until September 30, 2023: Provided, That such amount is designated by the Congress as an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985: Provided further, That the amount provided under this heading shall be available only if the President designates such amount as being for an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of such Act.

U.s. Immigration And Customs Enforcement

operations and support

For an additional amount for “Operations and Support” for necessary expenses to respond to the significant rise in unaccompanied minors and family unit aliens at the southwest border and related activities, and for the necessary expenses for enforcement of immigration and customs laws, detention and removal of aliens crossing the border unlawfully, and investigations, $534,566,000; of which $81,723,611 shall be available until September 30, 2020: Provided, That such amount is designated by the Congress as an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985: Provided further, That the amount provided under this heading shall be available only if the President designates such amount as being for an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of such Act.

DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

United States Marshals Service

federal prisoner detention

For an additional amount for “Federal Prisoner Detention”, $155,000,000: Provided, That such amount is designated by the Congress as an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985: Provided further, That the amount provided under this heading shall be available only if the President designates such amount as being for an emergency requirement pursuant to section 251(b)(2)(A)(i) of such Act.

This Act may be cited as the “Border Crisis Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2019”.