There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Patient Access to Higher Quality Health Care Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal changes made by health care reform laws to the Medicare exception to the prohibition on certain physician referrals for hospitals, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
06/04/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/03/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/03/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 06/03/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 06/03/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 06/03/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 06/03/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 06/03/2019
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 06/03/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 06/03/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 06/03/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 06/03/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 06/03/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 06/03/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 06/03/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 06/03/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 06/03/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10]* 06/03/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/03/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 06/13/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 06/13/2019
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/13/2019
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/24/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 06/24/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 07/15/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 07/18/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 07/18/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 07/25/2019
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 08/27/2019
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 09/06/2019
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 09/12/2019
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 09/17/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/17/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 09/18/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 10/01/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/21/2019
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 10/28/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/31/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 11/22/2019
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 12/16/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 12/16/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 01/03/2020
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/28/2020
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 03/09/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/03/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/04/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/03/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3062. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/03/2019)

Patient Access to Higher Quality Health Care Act of 2019

This bill repeals specified limitations, for purposes of Medicare participation, on self-referrals by newly constructed or expanded physician-owned hospitals.