There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Preserving America's Battlefields Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for partnerships among State and local governments, regional entities, and the private sector to preserve, conserve, and enhance the visitor experience at nationally significant battlefields of the American Revolution, War of 1812, and Civil War, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/22/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands
02/05/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/08/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (85)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 01/08/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 01/11/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 01/29/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 01/29/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 01/29/2019
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 01/29/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/07/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/07/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 03/06/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 03/07/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/14/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/25/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 03/25/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/25/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/26/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/04/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/09/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/12/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 04/29/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 04/30/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 05/07/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 05/07/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 05/07/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 05/10/2019
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6] 05/10/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/15/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/15/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/15/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/15/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 05/15/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/15/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/17/2019
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 05/17/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 05/17/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 05/22/2019
Rep. Armstrong, Kelly [R-ND-At Large] 05/22/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 05/23/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 06/06/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 06/12/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 06/18/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/18/2019
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 06/19/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/19/2019
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 06/28/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 06/28/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/28/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/28/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 07/10/2019
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 07/17/2019
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 07/19/2019
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/22/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 07/22/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/22/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 07/22/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/23/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 08/09/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/09/2019
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 08/09/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 08/09/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 08/09/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/09/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 08/20/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/08/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands02/05/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.307. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/08/2019)

Preserving America's Battlefields Act

This bill reauthorizes though FY2028 the Battlefield Acquisition Grant Program and expands the purposes of the American Battlefield Preservation Program to include

  • the preservation and protection of nationally significant battlefields of not only the Civil War but also the American Revolution and the War of 1812, and
  • the enhancement of visitors' experiences at those battlefields.