There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

TICK Act
Ticks: Identify, Control, and Knockout Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide assistance to combat the escalating burden of Lyme disease and other tick and vector-borne diseases and disorders.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/04/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/03/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/03/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 06/05/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/19/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/19/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 06/19/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/19/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/19/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/19/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 06/21/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/21/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/21/2019
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 06/21/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 06/21/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 06/21/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/21/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/21/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 06/21/2019
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/21/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/21/2019
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/21/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 06/21/2019
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 06/21/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/24/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 06/24/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/24/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 06/25/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 06/26/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/26/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/27/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/28/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/28/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/09/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 07/10/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/10/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/12/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 07/12/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/18/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 07/23/2019
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 07/23/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 08/16/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 08/30/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 09/17/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/04/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 10/04/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 10/17/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/23/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 10/23/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/30/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/08/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 11/08/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 11/08/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 11/18/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/26/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 12/03/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 12/04/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/04/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 12/05/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 12/09/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 12/09/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/09/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/03/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/04/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3073. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/03/2019)

Ticks: Identify, Control, and Knockout Act or the TICK Act

This bill establishes the Office of Oversight and Coordination for Vector-Borne Diseases within the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS). The office must develop a national strategy to address, and coordinate the federal response to, Lyme disease and other tick- and vector-borne diseases. The office must support research initiatives, tick- and disease-surveillance programs, and diagnostic-testing development, among other activities.

HHS must also award grants to support the establishment of Regional Centers of Excellence in Tick and Vector-Borne Diseases. Additionally, the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention must form cooperative agreements with state, local, and tribal health departments to address such diseases.