There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Extreme Risk Protection Order Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the issuance of extreme risk protection orders.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/04/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/28/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/04/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/04/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4223)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/04/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (100)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 06/20/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 06/20/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/20/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/20/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/20/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/20/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/20/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 06/20/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/20/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/20/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 06/20/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/20/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/20/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 06/20/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 07/15/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/15/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/15/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/15/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 07/15/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 07/15/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 07/15/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 07/15/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 07/15/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/15/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/15/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 07/15/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 08/06/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 08/06/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 08/06/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 08/06/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 08/06/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 08/06/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 08/06/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/06/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 08/06/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 08/16/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 08/16/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 08/16/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 08/16/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/16/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 08/16/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 08/16/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/16/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 08/16/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 08/16/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 08/16/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/16/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 08/27/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 08/27/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 08/27/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 08/27/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 08/27/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 08/27/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 08/27/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 08/27/2019
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 08/27/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 08/27/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 08/30/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 09/09/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 09/09/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 10/04/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 10/04/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/04/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security06/28/2019 Referred to

As of 10/18/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3076 - Federal Extreme Risk Protection Order Act of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.