There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Woman on the Twenty Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require $20 notes to include a portrait of Harriet Tubman, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/04/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/04/2019Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/04/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (106)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/04/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 06/06/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 06/06/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/06/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/06/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/06/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/06/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 06/12/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 06/12/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 06/12/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/12/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/12/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/12/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/12/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 06/12/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/18/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/18/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/18/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 06/18/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 06/20/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 06/20/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/24/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/25/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/25/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 06/25/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/26/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/26/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 06/26/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/26/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/26/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/26/2019
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/26/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/26/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/26/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/26/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/26/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/26/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/26/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/26/2019
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/26/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/26/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 06/26/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 06/26/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/26/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 06/26/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 06/26/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/26/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/26/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/26/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/26/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/26/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/26/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 06/26/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/26/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 06/26/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/27/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/27/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/27/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/27/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/27/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/28/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/28/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 06/28/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 06/28/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 06/28/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/28/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/28/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 06/28/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/28/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 06/28/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 06/28/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/28/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/28/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/28/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/28/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 06/28/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 06/28/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/28/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/28/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/28/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 06/28/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/28/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/28/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 06/28/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/28/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 06/28/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/28/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 06/28/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/09/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/09/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 07/09/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 07/09/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/12/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 07/15/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 08/16/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 08/23/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/09/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 10/21/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 10/29/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services06/04/2019 Referred to

As of 11/18/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3082 - Woman on the Twenty Act of 2019


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3082. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/04/2019)

Woman on the Twenty Act

This bill requires that all $20 Federal Reserve notes printed after December 31, 2022, prominently feature a portrait of Harriet Tubman on their front face.

The bill also instructs the Department of the Treasury to release to the public by December 31, 2020, the preliminary design of the $20 Federal Reserve note that shall prominently feature a portrait of Harriet Tubman.