Text: H.R.3082 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/04/2019)

 
[Congressional Bills 116th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H.R. 3082 Introduced in House (IH)]

<DOC>






116th CONGRESS
  1st Session
                                H. R. 3082

 To require $20 notes to include a portrait of Harriet Tubman, and for 
                            other purposes.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                              June 4, 2019

     Mrs. Beatty (for herself, Ms. Velazquez, Ms. Meng, Ms. Lee of 
 California, Mr. Raskin, Ms. Tlaib, Mr. Clay, Mr. Green of Texas, and 
Mr. Hastings) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the 
                    Committee on Financial Services

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
 To require $20 notes to include a portrait of Harriet Tubman, and for 
                            other purposes.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Woman on the Twenty Act of 2019''.

SEC. 2. FINDINGS.

    Congress finds the following:
            (1) In 1875, Congress adopted the dollar as the monetary 
        unit of the United States.
            (2) In 1877, the Bureau of Engraving and Printing of the 
        Department of the Treasury began printing all United States 
        paper money.
            (3) The Federal Reserve Act of 1913 created the Federal 
        Reserve as the Nation's central bank and provided for a 
        national banking system. The Board of Governors of the Federal 
        Reserve System issued new paper money called Federal Reserve 
        notes.
            (4) The Secretary of the Treasury has historically selected 
        the designs shown on Federal Reserve notes with the advice of 
        the Bureau of Engraving and Printing.
            (5) United States Federal Reserve notes now in production 
        bear the following portraits:
                    (A) President George Washington on the $1 bill.
                    (B) President Thomas Jefferson on the $2 bill.
                    (C) President Abraham Lincoln on the $5 bill.
                    (D) Alexander Hamilton on the $10 bill.
                    (E) President Andrew Jackson on the $20 bill.
                    (F) President Ulysses S. Grant on the $50 bill.
                    (G) Benjamin Franklin on the $100 bill.
            (6) There are also several denominations of Federal Reserve 
        notes that are no longer produced. These include the $500 bill 
        with the portrait of President William McKinley, the $1,000 
        bill with a portrait of President Grover Cleveland, the $5,000 
        bill with a portrait of President James Madison, the $10,000 
        bill with a portrait of Salmon P. Chase, and the $100,000 bill 
        with a portrait of President Woodrow Wilson.
            (7) Since the first general circulation of paper money, no 
        woman has ever held the honor of being featured on paper money.
            (8) In June 2015, then-Treasury Secretary Jack Lew 
        announced that the portrait of a woman would be featured on the 
        new $10 bill.
            (9) After a lengthy period of public engagement between the 
        public and the Department of the Treasury, on April 20, 2016, 
        then-Treasury Secretary Lew announced that ``for the first time 
        in more than a century, the front of our currency will feature 
        the portrait of a woman--Harriet Tubman on the $20 note.'' 
        Additionally, the Secretary announced the reverse of the new 
        $10 note would feature an image of the historic march for 
        suffrage that ended on the steps of the United States 
        Department of Treasury, featuring the leaders of the suffrage 
        movement--Lucretia Mott, Sojourner Truth, Susan B. Anthony, 
        Elizabeth Cady Stanton, and Alice Paul. Finally, the Secretary 
        also announced the reverse of the $5 note would feature an 
        image of historic figures at the Lincoln Memorial who shaped 
        our history and democracy, including Marian Anderson, Eleanor 
        Roosevelt, and Martin Luther King, Jr.

SEC. 3. HARRIET TUBMAN ON THE $20 NOTE.

    (a) In General.--Section 5114(b) of title 31, United States Code, 
is amended by adding at the end the following: ``No $20 note of United 
States currency may be printed after December 31, 2022, which does not 
prominently feature a portrait of Harriet Tubman on the front face of 
the note.''.
    (b) Preliminary Design.--The Secretary of the Treasury shall 
release to the public the preliminary design of the $20 note 
prominently featuring a portrait of Harriet Tubman no later than 
December 31, 2020.
                                 <all>

Share This