There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop Arctic Ocean Drilling Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit drilling in the Arctic Ocean.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/05/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/08/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 01/08/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/10/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 01/10/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 01/10/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 01/17/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/24/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/04/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 02/04/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/05/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/05/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 02/06/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/06/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/06/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 02/07/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 02/07/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 02/11/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 02/13/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/14/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 02/14/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/04/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/05/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/05/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/27/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/09/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/09/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/09/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 04/09/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 04/09/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 04/18/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 04/18/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/25/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/25/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/14/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/14/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/26/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 11/12/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 11/12/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/12/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/12/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/12/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/12/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 11/12/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 11/12/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/12/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 11/12/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 11/12/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 11/12/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/15/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 11/15/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 11/15/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 11/15/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/15/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 11/15/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/15/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/21/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/08/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources02/05/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.309. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/08/2019)

Stop Arctic Ocean Drilling Act of 2019

This bill prohibits the Department of the Interior from issuing or renewing a lease or any other authorization for the exploration, development, or production of oil, natural gas, or any other mineral in the Arctic Ocean, including the Beaufort Sea and Chukchi Sea Planning Areas.