There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (8)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Domestic and International Terrorism DATA Act
Domestic and International Terrorism Documentation and Analysis of Threats in America Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Domestic and International Terrorism DATA Act
Domestic and International Terrorism Documentation and Analysis of Threats in America Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Domestic Terrorism DATA Act
Domestic Terrorism Documentation and Analysis of Threats in America Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To require a joint domestic and international terrorism report, authorize research within the Department of Homeland Security on current trends in domestic terrorism, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To require a joint domestic terrorism report, establish within the Department of Homeland Security a National Center for the Study of Domestic Terrorism, authorize research within the Department of Homeland Security on current trends in domestic terrorism, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
09/26/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8027-8028)
09/19/2019Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
09/19/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-213, Part I.
06/05/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/15/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/26/2019-3:10pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2019-3:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2019-3:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8027-8028)
09/26/2019-2:56pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3106.
09/26/2019-2:56pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8027-8032)
09/26/2019-2:56pmHouseMr. Thompson (MS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/19/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 168.
09/19/2019HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
09/19/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-213, Part I.
07/17/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/17/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/17/2019HouseSubcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism Discharged.
06/28/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/18/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/05/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/05/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/05/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/11/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 06/11/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/11/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 06/13/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/13/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/18/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/24/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 07/09/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/09/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 07/12/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/16/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/25/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/25/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 08/02/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 08/06/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 08/06/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 08/06/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/06/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 08/06/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 08/09/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 08/09/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 08/09/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 08/09/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/09/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 08/20/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 08/20/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 08/20/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 08/20/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 08/20/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 08/20/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 08/20/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 08/20/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 08/20/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 08/27/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 08/27/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 09/10/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/16/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/17/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 09/17/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 09/19/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security06/05/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Markup by
09/19/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-213
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism06/18/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Discharged from
House Judiciary06/05/2019 Referred to
09/19/2019 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security06/28/2019 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs10/15/2019 Referred to

As of 04/05/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3106 - Domestic and International Terrorism DATA Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.