There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Improving Seniors' Timely Access to Care Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to establish requirements with respect to the use of prior authorization under Medicare Advantage plans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/05/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/05/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/05/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/05/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (96)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/25/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/25/2019
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 07/25/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/25/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/25/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/25/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/25/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 07/25/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 07/25/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/25/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 07/25/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 07/25/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/25/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/25/2019
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 07/25/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/25/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/25/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 07/25/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 07/25/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 07/25/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 07/25/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 07/25/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 07/25/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 07/25/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 07/25/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/25/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 07/25/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 09/10/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/10/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/10/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 09/10/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/10/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/10/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 09/10/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 09/10/2019
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 09/10/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 09/10/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 09/10/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 09/10/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 09/10/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/19/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 09/19/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 09/19/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/19/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/20/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/20/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 09/26/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/26/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 09/26/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/26/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/26/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 09/26/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 09/26/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 09/26/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 09/26/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 09/26/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 09/26/2019
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/26/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 09/26/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/26/2019
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large] 09/26/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 09/26/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 09/26/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/27/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 09/27/2019
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/27/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 09/27/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/27/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 09/27/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 10/04/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/04/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/04/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/04/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 10/04/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 10/04/2019
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 10/04/2019
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 10/04/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 10/04/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 10/04/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 10/04/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 10/04/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/04/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 10/08/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 10/11/2019
Rep. Armstrong, Kelly [R-ND-At Large] 10/16/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 10/16/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/16/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 10/16/2019
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 10/16/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 10/17/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 10/17/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 10/18/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 10/18/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/05/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce06/05/2019 Referred to

As of 10/23/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3107 - Improving Seniors' Timely Access to Care Act of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.