There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the United States Postal Service to sell the Alzheimer's semipostal stamp for 6 additional years.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/05/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/05/2019Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/05/2019Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/05/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (137)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/12/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 06/12/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/12/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 06/12/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/12/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/12/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/12/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/12/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 06/12/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/12/2019
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/27/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/27/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/27/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 06/27/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/27/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 06/27/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/27/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/27/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 06/27/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/27/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 06/27/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/27/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/27/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/27/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 06/27/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 06/27/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/27/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 06/27/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 06/27/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/27/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 06/28/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 06/28/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 07/09/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/09/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 07/09/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/09/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/11/2019
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/11/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/11/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/11/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/11/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/11/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 07/11/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/11/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/11/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 07/11/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/25/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/25/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/25/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 07/25/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 07/25/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 07/25/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/25/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 07/25/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 07/25/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/25/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/25/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/25/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/25/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/25/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/25/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 07/25/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/25/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/25/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/25/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 07/25/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/25/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/25/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/25/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 07/25/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 07/25/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/25/2019
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/25/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 07/25/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/25/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 07/25/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 07/25/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 07/25/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 08/06/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 08/06/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/06/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 08/16/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 08/16/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 08/16/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 08/16/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 08/16/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 08/16/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 09/16/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 09/16/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 09/16/2019
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 09/16/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 09/16/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 09/16/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/16/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/16/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/16/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 09/27/2019
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 09/27/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/18/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 10/18/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/18/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 10/18/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/18/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 10/18/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/18/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 10/18/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 10/18/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 10/18/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 10/18/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/18/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 10/18/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 10/18/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 10/18/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 10/18/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 10/30/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 10/30/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 10/30/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 10/30/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/30/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 10/30/2019
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 10/30/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 10/30/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/30/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 10/30/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 10/30/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/30/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 10/30/2019
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/30/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 10/30/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/30/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 10/30/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 10/30/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 10/30/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/30/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/30/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/30/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform06/05/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce06/05/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.