There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Living Shorelines Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to make grants to State and local governments and nongovernmental organizations for purposes of carrying out climate-resilient living shoreline projects that protect coastal communities by supporting ecosystem functions and habitats with the use of natural materials and systems, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/05/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
09/25/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 13.
09/25/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/25/2019Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
07/25/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife
06/18/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/05/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/05/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/12/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/12/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/12/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 06/12/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 07/22/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 07/22/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 07/22/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/22/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 07/22/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 07/24/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 07/24/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 07/24/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/25/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/09/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 09/24/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/24/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/24/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 09/24/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 09/24/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/24/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/24/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 09/24/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/25/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 09/25/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/25/2019
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 09/25/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/26/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/26/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 10/11/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/11/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources06/05/2019 Referred to
09/25/2019 Markup by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife06/18/2019 Referred to
07/25/2019 Hearings by
09/25/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3115. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/05/2019)

Living Shorelines Act of 2019

This bill directs the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to award grants to state or local governments, Indian tribes, or nonprofit organizations to (1) implement climate-resilient living shoreline projects; and (2) encourage innovation in the use of natural materials to protect coastal communities, habitats, and natural system functions.