There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe Reservation Reaffirmation Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe Reservation Reaffirmation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe Reservation Reaffirmation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reaffirm the Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe reservation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/15/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 275 - 146 (Roll no. 207).(text: CR H3817)
05/10/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-54.
01/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
05/20/2019SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 92.
05/16/2019SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
05/15/2019-3:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/15/2019-3:56pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 275 - 146 (Roll no. 207). (text: CR H3817)
05/15/2019-3:23pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
05/15/2019-2:25pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 312.
05/15/2019-2:22pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 5, H.R. 312 and H.R. 987. The resolution provides for 90 minutes of debate on H.R. 5, under a closed rule. Section 2 of the resolution provides for 60 minutes of debate on H.R. 312, under a closed rule and section 3 provides 90 minutes of debate on H.R. 987, under a structured rule.
05/15/2019-2:22pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 377. (consideration: CR H3816-3824)
05/14/2019-8:32pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 377 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5, H.R. 312 and H.R. 987. The resolution provides for 90 minutes of debate on H.R. 5, under a closed rule. Section 2 of the resolution provides for 60 minutes of debate on H.R. 312, under a closed rule and section 3 provides 90 minutes of debate on H.R. 987, under a structured rule.
05/10/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 32.
05/10/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-54.
05/01/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 10.
05/01/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/01/2019HouseSubcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged.
04/03/2019HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States
02/05/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/08/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/08/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/08/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 01/08/2019
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 01/17/2019
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 01/17/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/17/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 01/17/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 01/17/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/17/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 04/01/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 04/01/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 04/08/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 04/08/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 04/08/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/08/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 04/08/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/08/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 05/10/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 05/10/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 05/10/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 05/10/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 05/10/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/10/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/10/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 05/10/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/10/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 05/10/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 05/10/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/10/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/10/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 05/10/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/08/2019 Referred to
05/01/2019 Markup by
05/10/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-54
House Natural Resources Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States02/05/2019 Referred to
04/03/2019 Hearings by
05/01/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.312. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (05/10/2019)

Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe Reservation Reaffirmation Act

This bill reaffirms the Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe reservation as trust land in Massachusetts.

In addition, the bill requires actions, including actions pending in federal court, relating to the land to be dismissed.