Text: H.R.312 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (05/20/2019)

Calendar No. 92

116th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 312


To reaffirm the Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe reservation, and for other purposes.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

May 16, 2019

Received; read the first time

May 20, 2019

Read the second time and placed on the calendar


AN ACT

To reaffirm the Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe reservation, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe Reservation Reaffirmation Act”.

SEC. 2. Reaffirmation of Indian trust land.

(a) In general.—The taking of land into trust by the United States for the benefit of the Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe of Massachusetts as described in the final Notice of Reservation Proclamation (81 Fed. Reg. 948; January 8, 2016) is reaffirmed as trust land and the actions of the Secretary of the Interior in taking that land into trust are ratified and confirmed.

(b) Application.—Notwithstanding any other provision of law, an action (including an action pending in a Federal court as of the date of enactment of this Act) relating to the land described in subsection (a) shall not be filed or maintained in a Federal court and shall be promptly dismissed.

(c) Applicability of laws.—All laws (including regulations) of the United States of general applicability to Indians or nations, Indian Tribes, or bands of Indians (including the Act of June 18, 1934 (25 U.S.C. 5101 et seq.)), shall be applicable to the Tribe and Tribal members, except that to the extent such laws and regulations are inconsistent with the terms of the Intergovernmental Agreement, dated April 22, 2008, by and between the Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe and the Town of Mashpee, Massachusetts, the terms of that Intergovernmental Agreement shall control.

Passed the House of Representatives May 15, 2019.

Attest:
Cheryl L. Johnson,

Clerk.  


Calendar No. 92

116th CONGRESS
     1st Session
H. R. 312

AN ACT
To reaffirm the Mashpee Wampanoag Tribe reservation, and for other purposes.

May 20, 2019
Read the second time and placed on the calendar