There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

‘Six Triple Eight’ Congressional Gold Medal Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To award a Congressional Gold Medal to the members of the Women's Army Corps who were assigned to the 6888th Central Postal Directory Battalion, known as the "Six Triple Eight".


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/05/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/05/2019Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/05/2019Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/05/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (106)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/05/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/05/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/05/2019
Del. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/05/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/06/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/06/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/13/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 06/24/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/27/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 07/02/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/02/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/11/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/17/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/18/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 08/02/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 08/02/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 08/02/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 08/02/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 08/06/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 08/09/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 09/06/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/11/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 09/11/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 09/16/2019
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 09/16/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 09/19/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 09/24/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 10/01/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/01/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/11/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/16/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 10/18/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 10/22/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 10/28/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 10/31/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 11/08/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 11/13/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 11/13/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 11/13/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 11/19/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/26/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 11/26/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 11/26/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/04/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 12/06/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/19/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/07/2020
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 01/28/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 01/30/2020
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 02/03/2020
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/25/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 03/09/2020
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 03/09/2020
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 03/11/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 05/22/2020
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/04/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/25/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 09/11/2020
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 09/29/2020
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/29/2020
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 09/29/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 10/09/2020
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 10/27/2020
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 11/05/2020
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 11/30/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 11/30/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 12/07/2020
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 12/14/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/16/2020
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 12/16/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 12/24/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services06/05/2019 Referred to
Committee on House Administration06/05/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3138. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/05/2019)

"Six Triple Eight" Congressional Gold Medal Act of 2019

This bill directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the award of a Congressional Gold Medal in honor of the women of the 6888th Central Postal Directory Battalion (commonly known as the "Six Triple Eight") in recognition of their pioneering military service, devotion to duty, and contributions to increase the morale of personnel stationed in the European theater of operations during World War II.

The medal shall be given to the Smithsonian Institution and made available for display and research.