There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Community Reclamation Partnerships Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Surface Mining Control and Reclamation Act of 1977 to authorize partnerships between States and nongovernmental entities for the purpose of reclaiming and restoring land and water resources adversely affected by coal mining activities before August 3, 1977, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
05/01/2019Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
05/01/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/01/2019Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
03/28/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
02/05/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/08/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/08/2019 Referred to
05/01/2019 Markup by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources02/05/2019 Referred to
03/28/2019 Hearings by
05/01/2019 Discharged from

As of 06/16/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.315 - Community Reclamation Partnerships Act.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.315. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/08/2019)

Community Reclamation Partnerships Act

This bill revises the Abandoned Mine Land Reclamation Program which restores land and water adversely impacted by surface coal mines that were abandoned before August 3, 1977.

A state with an approved reclamation program may enter into a memorandum of understanding with relevant federal or state agencies for remediating mine drainage on abandoned mine land and water impacted by abandoned mines.

In addition, the bill authorizes a partnership between a state and a community reclaimer for remediating abandoned mine land if

  • the partnership's proposed project is consistent with an approved state memorandum of understanding and conducted on certain prioritized sites;
  • the state assumes all responsibly on behalf of the community reclaimer and the owner of the proposed project site for costs or damages resulting from actions or inactions of the community reclaimer in carrying out the project, except for gross negligence or intentional misconduct by the community reclaimer; and
  • the state has necessary legal authority to conduct the project and has financial resources to ensure the project's completion.

A community reclaimer is a person who (1) voluntarily assists a state in a reclamation project, (2) did not participate in the creation of site conditions at the proposed site or activities that caused any land or waters to become eligible for reclamation or drainage abatement expenditures, (3) is not a past or current owner or operator of any site with ongoing reclamation obligations, and (4) is not subject to outstanding violations of surface coal mining permits.