There are 8 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (13)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

EFFORT Act
Expanding Findings for Federal Opioid Research and Treatment Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

EFFORT Act
Expanding Findings for Federal Opioid Research and Treatment Act

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

EFFORT Act
Expanding Findings for Federal Opioid Research and Treatment Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

EFFORT Act
Expanding Findings for Federal Opioid Research and Treatment Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

EFFORT Act
Expanding Findings for Federal Opioid Research and Treatment Act

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

EFFORT Act
Expanding Findings for Federal Opioid Research and Treatment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Director of the National Science Foundation to support research on opioid addiction, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
01/13/2021Became Public Law No: 116-335. (TXT | PDF)
01/13/2021Signed by President.
01/01/2021Presented to President.
12/31/2020Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H9170)
12/22/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
08/06/2020Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-248.
07/23/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7172)
06/27/2019Reported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-131.
06/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/13/2021Became Public Law No: 116-335. (TXT | PDF)
01/13/2021Signed by President.
01/01/2021HousePresented to President.
12/31/2020-10:05amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/31/2020-10:05amHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H9170)
12/31/2020-10:05amHouseMrs. Dingell asked unanimous consent to take the bill, H.R. 3153, from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H9170)
12/22/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/22/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7929)
12/22/2020SenateS.Amdt.2732 Amendment SA 2732 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/22/2020SenateS.Amdt.2732 Amendment SA 2732 proposed by Senator Boozman for Senator Wicker. (consideration: CR S7929; text: CR S7929) In the nature of a substitute.
12/22/2020SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
12/22/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7929; text: CR S7929)
08/06/2020SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 510.
08/06/2020SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-248.
11/13/2019SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/24/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
07/23/2019-2:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2019-2:49pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7172)
07/23/2019-2:36pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3153.
07/23/2019-2:36pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7172-7173)
07/23/2019-2:36pmHouseMs. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/27/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 95.
06/27/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-131.
06/20/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
06/06/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
06/06/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (25)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Science, Space, and Technology06/06/2019 Referred to
06/20/2019 Markup by
06/27/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-131
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/24/2019 Referred to
11/13/2019 Markup by
08/06/2020 Reported by S. Rept. 116-248

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (7)

There are 7 summaries for H.R.3153. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-335 (01/13/2021)

Expanding Findings for Federal Opioid Research and Treatment Act or the EFFORT Act

This bill directs the National Science Foundation to support merit-reviewed and competitively awarded research on the science of opioid addiction.