There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Broadband Data Improvement Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve broadband data collection, mapping, and validation to support the effective deployment of broadband services to all areas of the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/07/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/06/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 06/06/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 06/06/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 06/06/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 06/06/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/06/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 06/12/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/12/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 06/12/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 06/27/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/28/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 06/28/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 06/28/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 07/10/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 07/10/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 07/10/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 07/10/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/11/2019
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 07/11/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 07/11/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/11/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 07/11/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 07/11/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 07/17/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/17/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/24/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 07/30/2019
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2] 08/16/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/16/2019
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 08/16/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 08/27/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 08/27/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 09/09/2019
Rep. Pence, Greg [R-IN-6] 09/09/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 09/10/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 09/19/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 09/19/2019
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 09/26/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 09/26/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 09/27/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 10/16/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 10/16/2019
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6] 10/16/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 10/21/2019
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 10/29/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 11/14/2019
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 11/19/2019
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 12/06/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 12/06/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 09/11/2020
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 10/23/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce06/06/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology06/07/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3162. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/06/2019)

Broadband Data Improvement Act of 2019

This bill requires (1) broadband service providers to fulfill certain reporting requirements, and (2) the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to establish a challenge process to aid in broadband mapping.

Specifically, the bill requires each provider to report certain information regarding the geographic availability of broadband service it provides. The FCC must contract with an entity to provide data submission assistance to a provider that is unable to comply with this reporting requirement. Among other responsibilities, such entity shall provide support for the required challenge process and establish an ongoing data validation and verification process.

The FCC is also required to establish a framework for a process whereby information challenging the accuracy of the National Broadband Map may be submitted. Subject to the challenge process and feedback received therefrom, specified federal agencies shall use the National Broadband Map to determine the extent of broadband availability and the areas of the United States that remain unserved.