There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Santa Ynez Band of Chumash Indians Land Affirmation Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Santa Ynez Band of Chumash Indians Land Affirmation Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

Santa Ynez Band of Chumash Indians Land Affirmation Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reaffirm the action of the Secretary of the Interior to take land into trust for the benefit of the Santa Ynez Band of Chumash Mission Indians, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
01/06/2020Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-191.
04/29/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3292)
01/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/06/2020SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 400.
01/06/2020SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-191.
11/06/2019SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
04/30/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
04/29/2019-7:08pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/29/2019-7:08pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3292)
04/29/2019-7:08pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3295)
04/29/2019-5:02pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Van Drew objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
04/29/2019-4:52pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 317.
04/29/2019-4:52pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3291-3293)
04/29/2019-4:51pmHouseMr. Van Drew moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/05/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/08/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/08/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 01/08/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources01/08/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indigenous Peoples of the United States02/05/2019 Referred to
Senate Indian Affairs04/30/2019 Referred to
11/06/2019 Markup by
01/06/2020 Reported by S. Rept. 116-191

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.317. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (01/06/2020)

Santa Ynez Band of Chumash Indians Land Affirmation Act of 2019

This bill takes approximately 1,427 acres of land in Santa Barbara County, California, into trust for the benefit of the Santa Ynez Band of Chumash Indians, subject to existing rights, contracts, and management agreements relating to easements and rights-of-way. The land is made part of the Santa Ynez Indian Reservation.

The bill removes restrictions on the land pursuant to certain state laws.

Under the bill, gaming is prohibited on this land.