There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

CECL Consumer Impact and Study Bill of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Securities and Exchange Commission and certain Federal agencies to carry out a study relating to accounting standards, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/28/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
06/10/2019Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/10/2019Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/10/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 06/11/2019
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 06/25/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 06/25/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 06/27/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 07/02/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 07/02/2019
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 07/02/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/09/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/09/2019
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/10/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/10/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/10/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 07/12/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/12/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 07/15/2019
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/15/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 07/16/2019
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/16/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 07/16/2019
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/22/2019
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1] 07/22/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/22/2019
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 07/22/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 07/24/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 08/02/2019
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 08/02/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/10/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 09/10/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 09/17/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/17/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 09/17/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 09/17/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 09/25/2019
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/25/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/25/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 09/25/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 09/27/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 09/27/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 09/27/2019
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 10/15/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/15/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 10/15/2019
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/15/2019
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 10/21/2019
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4] 10/23/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 10/29/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/29/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 10/29/2019
Rep. Bishop, Dan [R-NC-9] 11/13/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 11/19/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/21/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 12/04/2019
Rep. Pence, Greg [R-IN-6] 01/27/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services06/10/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture06/10/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit06/28/2019 Referred to

As of 02/18/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3182 - CECL Consumer Impact and Study Bill of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.