There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

FEEDD Act
Feed Emergency Enhancement During Disasters Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Crop Insurance Act to allow certain producers who harvest or graze covered crops planted as a result of a prevented planting to be eligible for certain crop insurance, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
06/28/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
06/19/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4775-4776)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/10/2019Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/10/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Armstrong, Kelly [R-ND-At Large]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 06/10/2019
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/12/2019
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 06/12/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 06/12/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/12/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/13/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 06/13/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 06/13/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/18/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 06/18/2019
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 06/18/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/18/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/18/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/18/2019
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/18/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 06/18/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 06/20/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/21/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/25/2019
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 06/25/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 06/28/2019
Rep. Pence, Greg [R-IN-6] 07/09/2019
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 07/10/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 07/16/2019
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 10/16/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 12/18/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Agriculture06/10/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management06/28/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3183. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/10/2019)

Feed Emergency Enhancement During Disasters Act or the FEEDD Act

This bill modifies the federal crop insurance program to authorize agricultural producers who harvest second crops as a result of a prevented planting to be eligible for specific crop insurance if certain conditions are met.

Specifically, a producer may collect an indemnity that is equal to 100% of the prevented planting guarantee for the acreage of the first crop if (1) the acres planted are in an area with low hay or forage supplies due to widespread excessive moisture, flood, or drought; (2) the second crop will be planted with an intended use of animal feed that is hayed, gazed, or chopped; and (3) the second crop will be donated or used by the producer.