There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

BURMA Act of 2019
Burma Unified through Rigorous Military Accountability Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

BURMA Act of 2019
Burma Unified through Rigorous Military Accountability Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize humanitarian assistance and impose sanctions with respect to human rights abuses in Burma, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/24/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 21 (Roll no. 541).(text: CR H7878-7883)
06/11/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/25/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
09/24/2019-7:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/24/2019-7:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 21 (Roll no. 541). (text: CR H7878-7883)
09/24/2019-6:21pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7888-7889)
09/24/2019-3:35pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/24/2019-3:28pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3190.
09/24/2019-3:28pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7878-7885)
09/24/2019-3:28pmHouseMr. Levin (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/20/2019HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
06/20/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/20/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/11/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/11/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/11/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/11/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/11/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/11/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/13/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/13/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/13/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 06/13/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/13/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/13/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 06/13/2019
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/13/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 06/13/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 06/18/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 06/18/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/18/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/18/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/18/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/18/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/20/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/20/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/20/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/20/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/20/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 06/20/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/20/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/20/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/20/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 06/20/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 06/20/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/20/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 06/20/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/20/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/24/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 06/24/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 06/24/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 06/24/2019
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/24/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 06/24/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/09/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 07/09/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 07/09/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 07/09/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 07/09/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/15/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 07/15/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/15/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 07/15/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/16/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/22/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/22/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 07/25/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 08/13/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 08/27/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 09/18/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/18/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 09/24/2019

Committees (6)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs06/11/2019 Referred to
06/20/2019 Markup by
House Armed Services06/11/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary06/11/2019 Referred to
House Financial Services06/11/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/11/2019 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations09/25/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3190. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (09/24/2019)

Burma Unified through Rigorous Military Accountability Act of 2019 or the BURMA Act of 2019

This act imposes sanctions, authorizes assistance, and requires the establishment of various programs and strategies related to Burma (Myanmar).

The President shall impose sanctions against current or former officials who are responsible for or who supported serious human rights abuses in Burma, as well as against entities controlled by such officials and military-linked entities that provide such officials significant financial benefits. The sanctions shall include asset blocking and visa blocking.

The bill authorizes humanitarian aid for Burma, Bangladesh, and the surrounding region for various purposes, including aid for ethnic minorities targeted by Burma's military and support for voluntary resettlement of displaced persons.

The Department of State shall maintain a publicly available website listing entities in Burma's gemstone sector that meet certain transparency and due-diligence requirements related to ownership, control, and supply-chain standards. The State Department shall also issue guidance for U.S. companies as to best practices for supply-chain due diligence when dealing with Burmese gemstone entities.

The State Department shall report to Congress on topics including (1) accountability for war crimes in Burma, and (2) a strategy for promoting economic development in Burma.