There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Improving Mental Health Access for Students Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To add suicide prevention resources to school identification cards.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/11/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/11/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/11/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E744)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/11/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 06/13/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 06/13/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/13/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/18/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/18/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/18/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 06/18/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/18/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/20/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/20/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/20/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/20/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 06/25/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/27/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/27/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 07/09/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/17/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 07/19/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/30/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/30/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 08/06/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 08/09/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 08/09/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 08/09/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 08/16/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/16/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/06/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/06/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 09/09/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 09/11/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/11/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/11/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 09/16/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 09/19/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 09/19/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 09/24/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 09/24/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/24/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/17/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/17/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/17/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 10/22/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/31/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/22/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 12/12/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/12/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/17/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 01/07/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 02/27/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/22/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and Labor06/11/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3192. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/11/2019)

Improving Mental Health Access for Students Act

This bill requires institutions of higher education (IHEs) that participate in federal student aid programs to share contact information for suicide prevention resources with students.

If IHEs distribute student identification cards, then they must include on the cards phone numbers for the National Suicide Prevention Lifeline, the Crisis Text Line, and a campus mental-health center or program.

If IHEs do not create such cards, then they must publish the numbers on the IHEs' websites.