There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Vera C. Rubin Observatory Designation Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Vera C. Rubin Observatory Designation Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Vera Rubin Survey Telescope Designation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Vera Rubin Survey Telescope Designation Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Vera C. Rubin Observatory Designation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To designate the Large Synoptic Survey Telescope as the "Vera C. Rubin Observatory".

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Large Synoptic Survey Telescope as the "Vera Rubin Survey Telescope".


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/2019Became Public Law No: 116-97. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2019Signed by President.
12/20/2019Presented to President.
12/18/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/18/2019Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7165)
07/23/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7176)
06/27/2019Reported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-132.
06/11/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/20/2019Became Public Law No: 116-97. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2019Signed by President.
12/20/2019HousePresented to President.
12/19/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/18/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/18/2019SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7165)
07/24/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
07/23/2019-3:06pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2019-3:06pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2019-3:06pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7176)
07/23/2019-2:59pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3196.
07/23/2019-2:59pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7176-7177)
07/23/2019-2:59pmHouseMs. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/27/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 96.
06/27/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-132.
06/20/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
06/20/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
06/11/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
06/11/2019HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E748)
06/11/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/19/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/19/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 06/19/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 06/19/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology06/11/2019 Referred to
06/20/2019 Markup by
06/27/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-132
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/24/2019 Referred to
12/18/2019 Discharged from

As of 08/10/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3196 - Vera C. Rubin Observatory Designation Act


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.3196. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-97 (12/20/2019)

Vera C. Rubin Observatory Designation Act

This bill designates the Large Synoptic Survey Telescope as the Vera C. Rubin Observatory.