There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Restoring Overtime Pay Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to establish a minimum salary threshold for bona fide executive, administrative, and professional employees exempt from Federal overtime compensation requirements, and automatically update such threshold every 3 years.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/11/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
06/11/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/11/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (106)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 06/11/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/11/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/20/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/20/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/20/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/20/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 06/24/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/24/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/24/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/24/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/24/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/24/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/24/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/24/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/25/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/25/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/25/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/25/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/09/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/15/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 07/15/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 07/15/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 07/15/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/15/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/15/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 07/15/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 07/15/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/15/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 07/30/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/30/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 07/30/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 07/30/2019
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 07/30/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 07/30/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 08/16/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 08/30/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/30/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/11/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/11/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/11/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/18/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 09/18/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 09/18/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 09/18/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/18/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/08/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 10/08/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 10/08/2019
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/08/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 10/21/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 10/21/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 10/21/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/18/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/20/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 11/20/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 11/21/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/21/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 11/22/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 12/06/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 02/26/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 02/28/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 02/28/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor06/11/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3197. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/11/2019)

Restoring Overtime Pay Act of 2019

This bill requires the Department of Labor to update the salary threshold applicable to bona fide executive, administrative, and professional employees for purposes of determining eligibility for overtime pay. The bill adopts rulemaking promulgated by Labor in 2016 that established the threshold for exempting such employees from overtime requirements at the 40th percentile of earnings for full-time salaried employees in the lowest-wage census region. The bill also requires updates to the threshold amount every three years.

In addition, the Bureau of Labor Statistics shall publish quarterly on its public website data on the weekly earnings of nonhourly, full-time salaried workers by census region.