There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Equal Access to Justice for Victims of Gun Violence Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal the Protection of Lawful Commerce in Arms Act, and provide for the discoverability and admissibility of gun trace information in civil proceedings.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/11/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/28/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/11/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/11/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/11/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/25/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/25/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/25/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/25/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/12/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/12/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 07/12/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/12/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/30/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/30/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/30/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/30/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 07/30/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/30/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/30/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/30/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/16/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 08/16/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 08/16/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 08/16/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 08/27/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 09/12/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 09/24/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 10/31/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/22/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/10/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/11/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security06/28/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3214. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/11/2019)

Equal Access to Justice for Victims of Gun Violence Act

This bill removes limitations on the civil liability of gun manufacturers and the disclosure of gun trace data in civil actions.

Specifically, the bill repeals the Protection of Lawful Commerce in Arms Act, which prohibits civil actions against a firearm or ammunition manufacturer, seller, importer, dealer, or trade association for damages resulting from the criminal or unlawful misuse of a firearm.

Additionally, the bill states that firearms trace data maintained by the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives is not immune from legal process. Such data is subject to discovery; is admissible as evidence; and may be used, relied on, or disclosed in a civil action or administrative proceeding.