There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Restoring Community Input and Public Protections in Oil and Gas Leasing Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Mineral Leasing Act to make certain adjustments in leasing on Federal lands for oil and gas drilling, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
06/28/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
06/20/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
06/13/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/12/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources06/12/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources06/13/2019 Referred to
06/20/2019 Hearings by
House Agriculture06/12/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry06/28/2019 Referred to

As of 11/19/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3225 - Restoring Community Input and Public Protections in Oil and Gas Leasing Act of 2019


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.