There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

VA Mission Telehealth Clarification Act

Short Titles as Introduced

VA Mission Telehealth Clarification Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize health professional trainees to provide treatment via telemedicine, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/22/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
06/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/23/2020SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 553.
09/22/2020-2:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/22/2020-2:18pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4680-4681)
09/22/2020-2:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3228.
09/22/2020-2:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4680-4682)
09/22/2020-2:06pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/30/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/30/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/23/2020HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/25/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/12/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/12/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (13)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/12/2019 Referred to
07/23/2020 Hearings by
07/30/2020 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health06/25/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3228. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/12/2019)

VA Mission Telehealth Clarification Act

This bill authorizes health professional trainees of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to provide treatment to veterans via telemedicine. To provide such treatment, a trainee must be under the supervision of a VA health care professional who is authorized to provide health care via telemedicine.