There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Restore the Harmony Way Bridge Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Restore the Harmony Way Bridge Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Restore the Harmony Way Bridge Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Restore the Harmony Way Bridge Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To transfer a bridge over the Wabash River to the New Harmony River Bridge Authority and the New Harmony and Wabash River Bridge Authority, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
08/23/2019Became Public Law No: 116-56. (TXT | PDF)
08/23/2019Signed by President.
08/13/2019Presented to President.
07/31/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5217)
07/24/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7290)
06/13/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
08/23/2019Became Public Law No: 116-56. (TXT | PDF)
08/23/2019Signed by President.
08/13/2019HousePresented to President.
07/31/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/31/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5217)
07/25/2019SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
07/24/2019-2:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/24/2019-2:13pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7290)
07/24/2019-2:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3245.
07/24/2019-2:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7290-7291)
07/24/2019-2:00pmHouseMr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/14/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/14/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/13/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
06/13/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/13/2019 Referred to
House Transportation Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment06/14/2019 Referred to
House Transportation Subcommittee on Highways and Transit06/14/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3245. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-56 (08/23/2019)

Restore the Harmony Way Bridge Act

This bill directs the White County Bridge Commission to convey to the New Harmony River Bridge Authority and the New Harmony and Wabash River Bridge Authority, all right, title, and interest of the commission in and to the bridge and the approaches thereto across the Wabash River at or near New Harmony, Indiana, and in land underneath or adjacent to such bridge and its approaches.

The Act of April 12, 1941, (creating the commission) is repealed effective on the date that the commission completes such conveyance.