There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Julius Rosenwald and the Rosenwald Schools Act of 2020

Short Titles as Introduced

Julius Rosenwald and the Rosenwald Schools Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a special resource study of the sites associated with the life and legacy of the noted American philanthropist and business executive Julius Rosenwald, with a special focus on the Rosenwald Schools, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
06/11/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-431.
06/13/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
06/11/2020Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 345.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/11/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-431.
03/11/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/11/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/11/2020Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
10/29/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands
06/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/13/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/13/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/19/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 07/05/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 07/05/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 07/09/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/16/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 07/22/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/30/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 07/30/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 08/30/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/04/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 10/04/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 10/11/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 10/15/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/17/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 10/28/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/29/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 10/31/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 11/13/2019
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 11/21/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 12/18/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/18/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 12/18/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 01/07/2020
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 01/07/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/08/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 01/13/2020
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/15/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 01/28/2020
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 02/12/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/21/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/21/2020
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 02/25/2020
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 02/28/2020
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 03/04/2020
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 06/11/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources06/13/2019 Referred to
03/11/2020 Markup by
06/11/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-431
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands06/25/2019 Referred to
10/29/2019 Hearings by
03/11/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3250. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (06/11/2020)

Julius Rosenwald and the Rosenwald Schools Act of 2020

This bill directs the Department of the Interior to study the sites associated with the life and legacy of Julius Rosenwald, a part owner and President of Sears, Roebuck and Company and a noted philanthropist who helped finance construction of 5,357 schools in 15 southern states between 1912 and 1932. The study shall include a special emphasis on specified sites, including certain Rosenwald Schools.

In conducting such study, Interior shall (1) evaluate the national significance of the sites; and (2) determine the suitability and feasibility of designating the sites as a unit of the National Park System, including an interpretive center in or near Chicago, Illinois.