There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Global Respect Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To impose sanctions on foreign persons responsible for violations of internationally recognized human rights against lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, or intersex (LGBTI) individuals, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/13/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
06/28/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/28/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/20/2019Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
06/20/2019Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
06/20/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/13/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/13/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/13/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 06/13/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 06/13/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 06/18/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 06/18/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/18/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 06/18/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 06/19/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/19/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 06/19/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/19/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/19/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 06/19/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 09/10/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs06/13/2019 Referred to
06/20/2019 Markup by
House Judiciary06/13/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship06/28/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties06/28/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.