There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Sustaining Excellence in Medicaid Act of 2019

Other Short Titles

Sustaining Excellence in Medicaid Act of 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Empowering Beneficiaries, Ensuring Access, and Strengthening Accountability Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Empowering Beneficiaries, Ensuring Access, and Strengthening Accountability Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Sustaining Excellence in Medicaid Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for certain extensions with respect to the Medicaid program under title XIX of the Social Security Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
08/06/2019Became Public Law No: 116-39. (TXT | PDF)
08/06/2019Signed by President.
08/01/2019Presented to President.
07/30/2019Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H7477-7478)
07/25/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
06/18/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 371 - 46 (Roll no. 333).(text: CR H4706-4707)
06/13/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
08/06/2019Became Public Law No: 116-39. (TXT | PDF)
08/06/2019Signed by President.
08/01/2019HousePresented to President.
07/30/2019-11:34amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/30/2019-11:34amHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H7477-7478)
07/30/2019-11:34amHouseMs. Norton asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H7477-7478)
07/25/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/25/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
07/25/2019SenateS.Amdt.930 Amendment SA 930 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
07/25/2019SenateS.Amdt.930 Amendment SA 930 proposed by Senator Scott FL for Senator Blunt. (consideration: CR S5114; text: CR S5114) In the nature of a substitute.
07/25/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5114)
06/19/2019SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
06/18/2019-9:50pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/18/2019-9:50pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 371 - 46 (Roll no. 333). (text: CR H4706-4707)
06/18/2019-9:18pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4751)
06/18/2019-3:06pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/18/2019-2:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3253.
06/18/2019-2:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4706-4710)
06/18/2019-2:45pmHouseMrs. Dingell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/13/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
06/13/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/13/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3253. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (06/18/2019)

Empowering Beneficiaries, Ensuring Access, and Strengthening Accountability Act of 2019

This bill alters several Medicaid programs and funding mechanisms. Specifically, the bill

  • makes appropriations through FY2024 for, and otherwise revises, the Money Follows the Person Rebalancing Demonstration Program;
  • allows state Medicaid fraud control units to review complaints regarding patients who are in noninstitutional or other settings;
  • temporarily extends the applicability of Medicaid eligibility criteria that protect against spousal impoverishment for recipients of home and community-based services;
  • temporarily extends the Medicaid demonstration program for certified community behavioral health clinics;
  • repeals the requirement, under the Medicaid Drug Rebate Program, that drug manufacturers include the prices of certain authorized generic drugs when determining the average manufacturer price (AMP) of brand name drugs (also known as a "blended AMP"), and excludes manufacturers from the definition of "wholesalers" for purposes of rebate calculations; and
  • increases funding available to the Medicaid Improvement Fund beginning in FY2021.