There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

LGBTQ Essential Data Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide a requirement to improve data collection efforts.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/13/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/14/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/13/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/13/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (80)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/13/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 06/13/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 06/13/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 06/13/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/18/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/15/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/16/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 07/24/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/30/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 08/09/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/25/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 11/21/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/24/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/13/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/14/2019 Referred to

As of 10/27/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3280 - LGBTQ Essential Data Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3280. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/13/2019)

LGBTQ Essential Data Act

This bill directs the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention to take measures to increase the frequency of collection of information on the sexual orientation and gender identity of deceased individuals through the National Violent Death Reporting System.