There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Hong Kong Human Rights and Democracy Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Hong Kong Human Rights and Democracy Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Hong Kong Policy Act of 1992 and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
10/15/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8119-8122)
06/13/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/16/2019SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 243.
10/15/2019-4:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/15/2019-4:07pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8119-8122)
10/15/2019-3:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3289.
10/15/2019-3:51pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8119-8124)
10/15/2019-3:50pmHouseMr. Sherman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/25/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
09/25/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/13/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/13/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/13/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/13/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 06/13/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 06/18/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 06/19/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 06/28/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 07/23/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 08/02/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 08/20/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 08/20/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/20/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 08/20/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 08/30/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 08/30/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 09/06/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/06/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/06/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/06/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 09/11/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 09/11/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/11/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/12/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/17/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/17/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 09/17/2019
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/17/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/18/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/19/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/20/2019
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4] 09/20/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 09/24/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 09/24/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/24/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/24/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/25/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/25/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 10/01/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 10/01/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 10/04/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 10/04/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/04/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 10/04/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 10/11/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/11/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs06/13/2019 Referred to
09/25/2019 Markup by
House Judiciary06/13/2019 Referred to
House Financial Services06/13/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3289. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (10/15/2019)

Hong Kong Human Rights and Democracy Act of 2019

This bill addresses Hong Kong's status under U.S. law and imposes sanctions on those responsible for human rights violations in Hong Kong. (Hong Kong is part of China but has a largely separate legal and economic system.)

The Department of State shall certify annually to Congress as to whether Hong Kong warrants its unique treatment under various treaties, agreements, and U.S. law. The analysis shall evaluate whether Hong Kong is upholding the rule of law and protecting rights enumerated in various documents, including (1) the agreement between the United Kingdom and China regarding Hong Kong's return to China, and (2) the Universal Declaration of Human Rights.

The bill extends existing annual reporting requirements on matters of U.S. interest in Hong Kong through 2027 and expands such reports to include assessments of (1) limits to Hong Kong's autonomy, either self-imposed or due to China's actions; and (2) whether rescission of Hong Kong's special treatment would further erode Hong Kong's autonomy.

The President shall annually report to Congress on Hong Kong's enforcement of U.S. export controls, including whether items of U.S. origin have been used for mass surveillance in China and whether Hong Kong has been used to evade sanctions on North Korea or Iran.

The State Department shall notify Congress if any proposed or enacted law in Hong Kong negatively impacts U.S. interests, including by putting U.S. citizens at risk of rendition to China.

The President shall impose property and visa-blocking sanctions on foreign persons responsible for gross human rights violations in Hong Kong.