There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

PRIDE Act of 2019
Promoting Respect for Individuals' Dignity and Equality Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House

PRIDE Act of 2019
Promoting Respect for Individuals' Dignity and Equality Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

PRIDE Act of 2019
Promoting Respect for Individuals' Dignity and Equality Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To permit legally married same-sex couples to amend their filing status for income tax returns outside the statute of limitations, to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to clarify that all provisions shall apply to legally married same-sex couples in the same manner as other married couples, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/24/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7313-7316)
07/18/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-161.
06/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/25/2019SenateReceived in the Senate.
07/24/2019-5:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/24/2019-5:00pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7313-7316)
07/24/2019-4:40pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3299.
07/24/2019-4:40pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7313-7318)
07/24/2019-4:40pmHouseMs. Chu, Judy moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/18/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 120.
07/18/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-161.
06/20/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/20/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/18/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
06/18/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 06/18/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/17/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 07/17/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/17/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/18/2019 Referred to
06/20/2019 Markup by
07/18/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-161

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3299. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (07/24/2019)

Promoting Respect for Individuals' Dignity and Equality Act of 2019 or the PRIDE Act of 2019

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to provide for equal treatment of same sex married couples. It permits such couples to amend their filing status to married filing jointly for tax returns outside of the statute of limitations and modifies tax rules relating to married couples to include same sex couples.