There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Gun Trafficking Prohibition Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To increase public safety by punishing and deterring firearms trafficking.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
01/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/03/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/11/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/11/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 01/11/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/11/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/11/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/11/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/11/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 01/11/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/11/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/11/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/11/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/16/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 01/16/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/07/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/27/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 03/11/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/11/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 03/11/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/18/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 03/25/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/08/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/15/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 04/29/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 04/30/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 06/19/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/24/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/09/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/25/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 08/09/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/20/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/09/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/24/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/13/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/13/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/21/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 08/28/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/03/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security01/03/2019 Referred to

As of 09/28/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.33 - Gun Trafficking Prohibition Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.33. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2019)

Gun Trafficking Prohibition Act

This bill establishes stand-alone criminal offenses for trafficking in firearms and straw purchasing of firearms.

The bill expands the categories of prohibited persons (i.e., persons barred from receiving or possessing a firearm or ammunition) to include persons who intend (1) to sell or transfer a firearm or ammunition to a prohibited person, (2) to sell or transfer a firearm to further a crime of violence or drug trafficking offense, or (3) to unlawfully export.

It increases the maximum prison term for the sale or transfer of a firearm to or the receipt or possession of a firearm by a prohibited person.

The bill revises the existing prohibition on transferring a firearm knowing that it will be used to commit a crime of violence or drug trafficking offense. It broadens the scope of unlawful conduct and increases the maximum prison term for a violator.

The bill also revises the existing prohibition on smuggling a firearm into the United States with the intent to unlawfully import or to promote a crime of violence or drug trafficking offense. It broadens the scope of unlawful conduct and increases the maximum prison term for a violator.

Finally, the bill makes it a crime to smuggle a firearm or ammunition out of the United States, or conspire or attempt to do so, with the intent to unlawfully export or to promote a crime of violence or drug trafficking offense.