There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Economic Mobility Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Economic Mobility Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide tax relief for workers and families, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
02/04/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-384.
06/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
02/04/2020Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 307.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-384.
06/20/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 19.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/20/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/18/2019Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/18/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Del. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 06/19/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 06/26/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means06/18/2019 Referred to
06/20/2019 Markup by
02/04/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-384

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3300. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (02/04/2020)

Economic Mobility Act of 2019

This bill modifies provisions relating to the earned income tax credit, the child tax credit, and the child and dependent care tax credit. Among other things, it increases the earned income tax credit in 2019 and 2020 for individuals with no qualifying children, makes the child and dependent care tax credits fully refundable during the same period, increases the child tax credit for children under the age of 4, increases the exclusion from employee gross income for employer-provided dependent care assistance, and provides for payments to U.S. possessions related to such credits.

The bill also eliminates the increase in unrelated business taxable income by expenses for certain fringe benefits for which a tax deduction is not allowed, including transportation and parking benefits or an on-premises athletic facility.