There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

National Guard and Reservists Debt Relief Extension Act of 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

National Guard and Reservists Debt Relief Extension Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House

National Guard and Reservists Debt Relief Extension Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

National Guard and Reservists Debt Relief Extension Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National Guard and Reservists Debt Relief Extension Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To exempt for an additional 4-year period, from the application of the means-test presumption of abuse under chapter 7, qualifying members of reserve components of the Armed Forces and members of the National Guard who, after September 11, 2001, are called to active duty or to perform a homeland defense activity for not less than 90 days.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
08/23/2019Became Public Law No: 116-53. (TXT | PDF)
08/23/2019Signed by President.
08/13/2019Presented to President.
08/01/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S5321)
07/23/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 1 (Roll no. 499).(text: CR H7216)
07/23/2019Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-170.
06/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/23/2019Became Public Law No: 116-53. (TXT | PDF)
08/23/2019Signed by President.
08/13/2019HousePresented to President.
08/01/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5321)
07/24/2019SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
07/23/2019-7:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2019-7:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 1 (Roll no. 499). (text: CR H7216)
07/23/2019-7:20pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7223-7224)
07/23/2019-6:25pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/23/2019-6:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3304.
07/23/2019-6:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7216-7217)
07/23/2019-6:20pmHouseMr. Cicilline moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/23/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 130.
07/23/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-170.
07/11/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/11/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/18/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
06/18/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6]* 06/18/2019
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2]* 06/18/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 06/18/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/18/2019 Referred to
07/11/2019 Markup by
07/23/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-170

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3304. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-53 (08/23/2019)

National Guard and Reservists Debt Relief Extension Act of 2019

This bill extends for an additional four years the exemption from the means test under Chapter 7 bankruptcy for qualifying members of an Armed Forces reserve component or the National Guard. Specifically, members who, after September 11, 2001, are called to active duty or to perform a homeland defense activity for not less than 90 days qualify for this exemption. Currently, the exemption expires on December 19, 2019.