There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

South Florida Clean Coastal Waters Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House

South Florida Clean Coastal Waters Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

South Florida Clean Coastal Waters Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Inter-Agency Task Force on Harmful Algal Blooms and Hypoxia to develop a plan for reducing, mitigating, and controlling harmful algal blooms and hypoxia in South Florida, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
09/26/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8010-8011)
09/11/2019Committee on Natural Resources discharged.
09/11/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-202, Part I.
01/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/15/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
09/26/2019-1:35pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2019-1:35pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8010-8011)
09/26/2019-1:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 335.
09/26/2019-1:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8010-8013)
09/26/2019-1:21pmHouseMs. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/11/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 159.
09/11/2019HouseCommittee on Natural Resources discharged.
09/11/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-202, Part I.
07/25/2019HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife
07/24/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
07/24/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
02/12/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
02/05/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/08/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/08/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/08/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 01/30/2019
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 07/18/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/18/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 07/30/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology01/08/2019 Referred to
07/24/2019 Markup by
09/11/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-202
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Environment02/12/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources01/08/2019 Referred to
09/11/2019 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife02/05/2019 Referred to
07/25/2019 Hearings by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation10/15/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.335. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (09/26/2019)

South Florida Clean Coastal Waters Act of 2019

This bill addresses harmful algal blooms and hypoxia in the South Florida ecosystem. An algal bloom is a rapid growth of algae that may create toxic or hypoxic (severely low-oxygen) conditions that are harmful to humans, animals, aquatic ecosystems, and the economy.

The Inter-Agency Task Force on Harmful Algal Blooms and Hypoxia must assess potential approaches to reduce harmful algal blooms and hypoxia in the ecosystem. The task force must also submit a plan, based on the assessment, for reducing, mitigating, and controlling harmful algal blooms and hypoxia in the region.