There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

VA Emergency Transportation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to reimburse veterans for the cost of emergency medical transportation to a Federal facility, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/19/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
07/16/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/19/2019Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/19/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/19/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17]* 06/19/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7]* 06/19/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 06/20/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 06/20/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/20/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/24/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 06/24/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/24/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 06/25/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/27/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 07/09/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/09/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 07/10/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/10/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 07/12/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 07/16/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/23/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 07/23/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/23/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 07/23/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 07/23/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/25/2019
Rep. Armstrong, Kelly [R-ND-At Large] 09/09/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 09/09/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 09/09/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 09/09/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 09/11/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/12/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 09/26/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 10/15/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 10/15/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 10/15/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 10/15/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/15/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/15/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 10/15/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/15/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 10/18/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 10/28/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 10/28/2019
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/28/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/30/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/12/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 11/12/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/03/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 12/03/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 12/04/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 01/30/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs06/19/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health07/16/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3350.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3350. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/19/2019)

VA Emergency Transportation Act

This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to reimburse a veteran for the reasonable value of emergency transportation by a non-VA provider (1) to a facility for emergency treatment, or (2) from a non-VA facility where the veteran was treated to a VA or other federal facility for additional care.