There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

VETS Safe Travel Act
Veterans Expedited TSA Screening Safe Travel Act

Short Titles as Introduced

VETS Safe Travel Act
Veterans Expedited TSA Screening Safe Travel Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide PreCheck to certain severely injured or disabled veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/12/2019Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
09/12/2019Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-203, Part I.
06/19/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
09/12/2019Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 160.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/12/2019Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/12/2019Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-203, Part I.
07/17/2019Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
07/17/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/16/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/19/2019Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/19/2019Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/19/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Pence, Greg [R-IN-6]* 06/19/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 06/19/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6]* 06/19/2019
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4] 07/11/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 07/11/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/11/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/11/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/11/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 07/12/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 07/12/2019
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7] 07/16/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 07/16/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 07/16/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 07/18/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/23/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/24/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/25/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 08/06/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 08/06/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/16/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 08/16/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 08/16/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 08/27/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/27/2019
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 08/27/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 08/27/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 08/27/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 08/30/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/06/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 09/09/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/09/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/10/2019
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large] 09/10/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 09/11/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 09/11/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 09/12/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 09/12/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/12/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security06/19/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Markup by
09/12/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-203
House Veterans' Affairs06/19/2019 Referred to
09/12/2019 Discharged from
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs07/16/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.