There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Strengthening America's Security in the Middle East Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Caesar Syria Civilian Protection Act of 2019
  • Combating BDS Act of 2019
  • Ileana Ros-Lehtinen United States- Israel Security Assistance Authorization Act of 2019
  • United States-Jordan Defense Cooperation Extension Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To make improvements to certain defense and security assistance provisions and to authorize theappropriation of funds to Israel, to reauthorize the United States-Jordan Defense Cooperation Act of 2015, and to halt the wholesale slaughter of the Syrian people, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
02/12/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
01/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/08/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Science, Space, and Technology, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Science, Space, and Technology, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Science, Space, and Technology, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Science, Space, and Technology, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Science, Space, and Technology, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 01/31/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 01/31/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 01/31/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/31/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 01/31/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/31/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 01/31/2019
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 02/05/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 02/05/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/05/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/05/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 02/05/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/08/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 02/08/2019
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 02/08/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 02/13/2019
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/13/2019
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 02/14/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 02/14/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/26/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/21/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 03/27/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/02/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 04/04/2019
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 04/10/2019
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/12/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/25/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/30/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 04/30/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 05/03/2019
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/03/2019
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/15/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/15/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 05/15/2019
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1] 05/16/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 05/16/2019
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/16/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/16/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/17/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 05/20/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/20/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 05/20/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/22/2019
Rep. Roy, Chip [R-TX-21] 05/22/2019
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 05/22/2019
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 05/22/2019
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/24/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 05/28/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 05/30/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 06/03/2019
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9] 06/06/2019
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 06/11/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/13/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/20/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 07/12/2019
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4] 07/22/2019
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 07/23/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/23/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 07/24/2019
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 07/25/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 07/25/2019
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/30/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 08/16/2019

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs01/08/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary01/08/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship01/08/2019 Referred to
House Financial Services01/08/2019 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology01/08/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services01/08/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.336. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/08/2019)

Strengthening America's Security in the Middle East Act of 2019

This bill authorizes assistance and weapons transfers to Israel, and extends defense cooperation with Jordan. It establishes additional sanctions related to the conflict in Syria, and allows states to divest from entities boycotting Israel.

Ileana Ros-Lehtinen United States-Israel Security Assistance Authorization Act of 2019

The bill reauthorizes through FY2028 Foreign Military Financing to Israel. It extends loan guarantees to Israel through FY2023, and authorizes the President to transfer precision-guided munitions to the country.

The bill directs the President to report on steps taken to help Israel secure a strategic trade authorization exception.

United States-Jordan Defense Cooperation Extension Act

The bill extends through 2022 arrangements that allow certain defense articles to be transferred to Jordan on an expedited basis. The bill also directs the President to submit a report to Congress assessing the costs and benefits of establishing a fund to support private investment in Jordan.

Caesar Syria Civilian Protection Act of 2019

The bill directs the Department of the Treasury to determine whether the Central Bank of Syria is a primary money-laundering concern and, if so, impose special measures on transactions involving the bank. The bill also imposes sanctions on individuals providing support for the Syrian government.

Combating BDS Act of 2019

The bill allows a state or local government to adopt measures to divest its assets from entities using boycotts, divestments, or sanctions to influence Israel's policies. Such measures shall meet various requirements, including those related to written notice and comment.