There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Small Airport Mothers' Rooms Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House

Small Airport Mothers' Rooms Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Airport Mothers' Rooms Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 49, United State Code, to require small hub airports to construct areas for nursing mothers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/16/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10280)
10/04/2019Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-221.
06/19/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/17/2019SenateReceived in the Senate.
12/16/2019-4:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/16/2019-4:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10280)
12/16/2019-3:57pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3362.
12/16/2019-3:57pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10280-10282)
12/16/2019-3:56pmHouseMrs. Fletcher moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/04/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 174.
10/04/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-221.
06/26/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/26/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/26/2019HouseSubcommittee on Aviation Discharged.
06/20/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/19/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
06/19/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/19/2019 Referred to
06/26/2019 Markup by
10/04/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-221
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation06/20/2019 Referred to
06/26/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3362. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (12/16/2019)

Small Airport Mothers' Rooms Act of 2019

This bill requires small hub airports to maintain a lactation area for nursing mothers and a baby changing table in at least one men's and one women's restroom in each passenger terminal building of the airport.

Currently, medium and large hub airports must comply with this requirement in FY2021 and each fiscal year thereafter. The bill requires a small hub airport to be in compliance by FY2023 and each fiscal year thereafter only if such airport has been categorized as a small or medium hub airport for the three consecutive fiscal years before a grant application is submitted.