There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Low-Wage Federal Contractor Employee Back Pay Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the compensation of Federal contractor employees that may be placed on unpaid leave as a result of the Federal Government shutdown, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
01/15/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E47)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2019Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E20-21)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 01/09/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 01/09/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 01/09/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/09/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/09/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 01/09/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/10/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 01/10/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 01/10/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 01/10/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 01/10/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/10/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/11/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/11/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/11/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/15/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/15/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 01/15/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 01/15/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/15/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 01/15/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/15/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 01/15/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 01/15/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/16/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/22/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 01/23/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 01/28/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 01/28/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 01/28/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/29/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/29/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 01/30/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/30/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/31/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/04/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/05/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/07/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/07/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/07/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 02/08/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/13/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/14/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 03/06/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/13/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform01/08/2019 Referred to

As of 05/23/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.339 - Low-Wage Federal Contractor Employee Back Pay Act of 2019.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.339. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/08/2019)

Low-Wage Federal Contractor Employee Back Pay Act of 2019

This bill requires the federal government to compensate employees of federal contractors that provide retail, food, custodial, or security services who are placed on unpaid leave as a result of a lapse in appropriations beginning in FY2019.