There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

CARE Act of 2019
Children's Act for Responsible Employment and Farm Safety of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to strengthen the provisions relating to child labor, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/20/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/20/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/20/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (33)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/20/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 06/20/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 06/27/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/27/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 06/27/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/10/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/10/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 07/10/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/18/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 07/18/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 10/11/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor06/20/2019 Referred to

As of 01/26/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3394 - Children's Act for Responsible Employment and Farm Safety of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.